TX HB523 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirement that certain elected school district boards make audio and video recordings of certain work sessions and special called meetings available on the Internet.
Title
Relating to the requirement that certain elected school district boards make audio and video recordings of certain work sessions and special called meetings available on the Internet.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Schofield [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Rep. Tomas Uresti [D] | Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R] |
Rep. Mark Keough [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1009 (Y: 137 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1009 (Y: 137 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | House | Passed |
2017-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation |
2017-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Education
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Open Meetings
City Government--General
Education
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Open Meetings