TX HB52 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Considered in Calendars

Summary

Relating to limitations on the automatic admission of undergraduate students to general academic teaching institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to limitations on the automatic admission of undergraduate students to general academic teaching institutions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-12 Considered in Calendars
2009-05-02 Considered in Calendars
2009-04-07 Committee report sent to Calendars
2009-04-07 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-04-06 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2009-03-25 Reported favorably as substituted
2009-03-25 Committee substitute considered in committee
2009-03-25 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-11 Left pending in committee
2009-03-11 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2009-03-11 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-11 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-02-12 Referred to Higher Education
2009-02-12 Read first time
2008-11-10 Filed

Same As/Similar To

SB175 (Similar To) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback