TX HB519 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-27 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the expunction of arrest records and files when a grand jury fails to find that probable cause exists to believe the alleged offense was committed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the expunction of arrest records and files when a grand jury fails to find that probable cause exists to believe the alleged offense was committed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2023-03-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2023-03-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-03-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-03-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2023-03-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2023-03-23HouseRecalled from subcommittee
2023-03-21HouseLeft pending in subcommittee
2023-03-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2023-03-21HouseConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2023-03-21HouseScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2023-02-28HouseReferred directly to subcommittee by chair
2023-02-23HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2023-02-23HouseRead first time
2022-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback