TX HB518 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-11)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the retention and use of sales tax revenue collected by certain retailers to provide job training and placement services to certain persons.
Title
Relating to the retention and use of sales tax revenue collected by certain retailers to provide job training and placement services to certain persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#341 (Y: 124 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 2nd time RV#334 (Y: 132 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#317 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 2nd time RV#334 (Y: 132 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#317 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-21 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Taxation
Taxation--Sales