TX HB501 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-05 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-05 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirement and study of insurance coverage for serious emotional disturbance of a child.
Title
Relating to the requirement and study of insurance coverage for serious emotional disturbance of a child.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-12-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB314 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety