TX HB500 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-10)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the effect of certain felony convictions of public elected officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the effect of certain felony convictions of public elected officers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2017-05-08HouseCompanion considered in lieu of
2017-05-04HousePostponed
2017-05-04HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-02HousePostponed
2017-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-02HousePlaced on Emergency Calendar
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-30HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-16HouseReferred to General Investigating & Ethics
2017-02-16HouseRead first time
2017-01-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback