TX HB5 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the expansion of broadband services to certain areas.
Title
Relating to the expansion of broadband services to certain areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1623 (Y: 133 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Amended RV#133 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#125 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#124 (Y: 42 N: 106 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - House - Rule 11, Section 2 RV#123 (Y: 87 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - RV#121 RV#122 (Y: 123 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - RV#121 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - RV#120 (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - RV#119 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - 2-Ashby RV#118 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1623 (Y: 133 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Amended RV#133 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#125 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#124 (Y: 42 N: 106 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - House - Rule 11, Section 2 RV#123 (Y: 87 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - RV#121 RV#122 (Y: 123 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - RV#121 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - RV#120 (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - RV#119 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - 2-Ashby RV#118 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds SR 516 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1623 |
2021-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-28 | House | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds HR 1868 |
2021-05-26 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-06 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-06 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-03 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-03 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-03 | House | House appoints conferees |
2021-05-03 | House | House requests conference committee |
2021-05-03 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2021-04-29 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-09 | House | Record vote RV#133 |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed as amended |
2021-04-09 | House | Amended 1-Slaton |
2021-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Record vote RV#125 |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-08 | House | Record vote RV#124 |
2021-04-08 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 9-Middleton |
2021-04-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-08 | House | Record vote RV#123 |
2021-04-08 | House | Amended 8-Cason |
2021-04-08 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2021-04-08 | House | Amendment(s) offered 8-Cason |
2021-04-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-08 | House | Record vote RV#122 |
2021-04-08 | House | Amended 7-Zwiener |
2021-04-08 | House | Record vote RV#121 |
2021-04-08 | House | Amended 6-Davis and Reynolds |
2021-04-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-08 | House | Record vote RV#120 |
2021-04-08 | House | Amended 5-Rodriguez |
2021-04-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-08 | House | Record vote RV#119 |
2021-04-08 | House | Amended 4-Hernandez |
2021-04-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-08 | House | Record vote RV#118 |
2021-04-08 | House | Amended 3-Price |
2021-04-08 | House | Amended 2-Ashby |
2021-04-08 | House | Amended 1-Ashby |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BROADBAND DEVELOPMENT OFFICE
BROADBAND NETWORKS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Governor
GOVERNOR'S BROADBAND COUNCIL
INTERNET
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Utilities
Utilities--Telecommunications
BROADBAND NETWORKS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Governor
GOVERNOR'S BROADBAND COUNCIL
INTERNET
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Utilities
Utilities--Telecommunications