TX HB4966 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to law enforcement agency personnel records and the reporting of separations of license holders to the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement.
Title
Relating to law enforcement agency personnel records and the reporting of separations of license holders to the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken King [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1089 (Y: 120 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-05 | House | Record vote RV#1089 |
2023-05-05 | House | Passed |
2023-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2023-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | House | Filed |