TX HB491 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requiring registration as a sex offender of certain defendants convicted of the offense of continuous trafficking of persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requiring registration as a sex offender of certain defendants convicted of the offense of continuous trafficking of persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#267 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - Read 2nd time RV#259 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-04-24SenateRead first time
2017-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-18HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-18HouseRecord vote
2017-04-18HousePassed
2017-04-18HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-17HouseRecord vote
2017-04-17HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-02-16HouseRead first time
2016-12-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback