TX HB4772 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an excise tax on, and storage, reporting, and recordkeeping requirements for, certain nontobacco nicotine products; providing a civil penalty; imposing a tax.
Title
Relating to an excise tax on, and storage, reporting, and recordkeeping requirements for, certain nontobacco nicotine products; providing a civil penalty; imposing a tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Shawn Thierry [D] | Rep. Dustin Burrows [R] | Rep. Candy Noble [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] |
Rep. Philip Cortez [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1348 (Y: 111 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - Amended RV#1290 (Y: 128 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - Amended RV#1290 (Y: 128 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1348 |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1290 |
2023-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-08 | House | Amended 1-Noble |
2023-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2023-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
Taxation
Taxation--Cigarette
Tobacco Products
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
Taxation
Taxation--Cigarette
Tobacco Products