TX HB4765 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Harris County Improvement District No. 27; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Harris County Improvement District No. 27; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1449 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07 Effective immediately
2019-06-07 Filed without the Governor's signature
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-24HouseRecommendations filed with the Speaker
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-22HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-22HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-21SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2019-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-21SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-05-19SenateReferred to Administration
2019-05-19SenateRead first time
2019-05-19SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-17HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-17HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1449
2019-05-17HousePassed
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-17HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-17HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-14HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-10HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-08HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-05-08HouseRead first time
2019-05-07HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2019-05-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback