TX HB4764 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of the Midlothian Municipal Management District No. 3 to impose an ad valorem tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of the Midlothian Municipal Management District No. 3 to impose an ad valorem tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseRecommendations filed with the Speaker
2019-05-15HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-14HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-06HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2019-05-06HouseRead first time
2019-05-06HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2019-05-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback