TX HB4763 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Spradley Farms Improvement District of Kaufman County; providing the authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Spradley Farms Improvement District of Kaufman County; providing the authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseRecommendations filed with the Speaker
2019-05-08HouseNo action taken in committee
2019-05-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07HousePosting rule suspended
2019-05-06HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-05-06HouseRead first time
2019-05-02HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2019-05-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback