TX HB4763 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Spradley Farms Improvement District of Kaufman County; providing the authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Spradley Farms Improvement District of Kaufman County; providing the authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | No action taken in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-07 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-05-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
MESQUITE, CITY OF
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
SPRADLEY FARMS IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT OF KAUFMAN COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
SPRADLEY FARMS IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT OF KAUFMAN COUNTY
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4763 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04763I.htm |