TX HB476 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain duties of public institutions of higher education and the Department of State Health Services regarding policies on the use of epinephrine auto-injectors by public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain duties of public institutions of higher education and the Department of State Health Services regarding policies on the use of epinephrine auto-injectors by public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#211 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-16 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-06 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-06SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-06HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-05HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-03HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenatePassed
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-03SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-03SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-03SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-26SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-26SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-15SenateReferred to Higher Education
2019-04-15SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#211
2019-04-09HousePassed
2019-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-08HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-02-20HouseRead first time
2018-12-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1736 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback