TX HB473 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - No action taken in committee
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - No action taken in committee
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting organ transplant recipient discrimination on the basis of certain disabilities.
Title
Relating to prohibiting organ transplant recipient discrimination on the basis of certain disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | No action taken in committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1017 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
ORGAN & TISSUE DONATIONS
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
ORGAN & TISSUE DONATIONS