TX HB4667 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transfer of certain state property from the Department of Public Safety to the City of Eagle Pass.
Title
Relating to the transfer of certain state property from the Department of Public Safety to the City of Eagle Pass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1584 (Y: 123 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - Permission to introduce RV#649 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - Permission to introduce RV#649 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-18 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1584 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-24 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1090 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-05-12 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-11 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-06 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2021-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | House | Filed |
2021-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#649 |
2021-05-03 | House | Permission to introduce |
Subjects
EAGLE PASS, CITY OF
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
PUBLIC SAFETY COMMISSION
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
PUBLIC SAFETY COMMISSION
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF