TX HB4666 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the modernization of the law governing the Port of Beaumont Navigation District of Jefferson County, Texas.
Title
Relating to the modernization of the law governing the Port of Beaumont Navigation District of Jefferson County, Texas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Texas Ports, Select |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#962 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-02 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-24 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-24 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-04-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-26 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2556 (Same As) 2019-05-25 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Subjects
PORT OF BEAUMONT NAVIGATION DISTRICT OF JEFFERSON COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility