TX HB4661 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to required sexual harassment prevention training for members of the legislature and lobbyists.
Title
Relating to required sexual harassment prevention training for members of the legislature and lobbyists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#977 (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Permission to introduce RV#519 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Permission to introduce RV#519 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#977 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-10 | House | Amendment adopted as amended 1-S. Thompson |
2021-05-10 | House | Amendment amended 2-S. Thompson |
2021-05-10 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-S. Thompson |
2021-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-28 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-28 | House | Filed |
2021-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#519 |
2021-04-28 | House | Permission to introduce |