TX HB466 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale of fireworks before and during the Diwali holiday.
Title
Relating to the sale of fireworks before and during the Diwali holiday.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#898 |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1162 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
DIWALI
Holidays
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Safety
Safety--Fireworks
TEXAS A&M FOREST SERVICE
County Government--General
DIWALI
Holidays
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Safety
Safety--Fireworks
TEXAS A&M FOREST SERVICE