TX HB466 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a prohibition on the use of student loan default or breach of a student loan repayment or scholarship contract as a ground for refusal to grant or renew an occupational license or other disciplinary action in relation to an occupational license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a prohibition on the use of student loan default or breach of a student loan repayment or scholarship contract as a ground for refusal to grant or renew an occupational license or other disciplinary action in relation to an occupational license.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-02-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-02-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-02-20HouseRead first time
2018-12-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB37 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Signed in the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback