TX HB4648 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the Lubbock County Hospital District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the Lubbock County Hospital District.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-02HousePosting rule suspended
2019-03-26HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-03-26HouseRead first time
2019-03-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2448 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback