TX HB4628 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Veale Ranch Municipal Management District No. 1; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Veale Ranch Municipal Management District No. 1; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1637 (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective immediately
2021-06-18 Filed without the Governor's signature
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1637
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenatePassed
2021-05-25SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-22SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-21SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-17SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-05-17SenateRead first time
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1090
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-05HouseRecommendations filed with the Speaker
2021-05-04HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-28HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-21HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-21HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-21HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-13HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2021-04-13HouseRead first time
2021-04-12HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2021-04-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2209 (Similar To) 2021-04-19 - Referred to Local Government
SB2209 (Similar To) 2021-04-19 - Referred to Local Government

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4628
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04628I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04628H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04628E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04628S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04628F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04628I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04628H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB04628H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB04628E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04628E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04628S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB04628S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04628F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4628&RcdVtNo=1090&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=110
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4628&RcdVtNo=1637&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments

feedback