TX HB4622 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the East Montgomery County Municipal Utility District No. 13; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the East Montgomery County Municipal Utility District No. 13; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-08 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-08 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 2217 |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-28 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-28 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-09 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2021-04-09 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-09 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-04-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2217 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
SB2217 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
SB2217 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
Subjects
EAST MONTGOMERY COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 13
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility