TX HB4618 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Hays Trinity Groundwater Conservation District; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Hays Trinity Groundwater Conservation District; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-06HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2021-04-07HouseRead first time
2021-04-07HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2021-04-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback