TX HB460 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the solicitation of pen pals by certain inmates of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
Title
Relating to the solicitation of pen pals by certain inmates of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R] | Rep. Candy Noble [R] | Rep. Sam Harless [R] | Rep. Eddie Morales [D] |
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Sen. Angela Paxton [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#314 (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#314 |
2021-04-16 | House | Passed |
2021-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-10 | House | Filed |