TX HB4571 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to measures to address student hunger at postsecondary educational institutions.
Title
Relating to measures to address student hunger at postsecondary educational institutions.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bucy [D] | Rep. James Talarico [D] | Rep. John Kuempel [R] | Rep. Josey Garcia [D] |
Rep. Diego Bernal [D] | Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] | Rep. Lina Ortega [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1023 (Y: 78 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Read 2nd time RV#981 (Y: 82 N: 60 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - Read 2nd time RV#981 (Y: 82 N: 60 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-04 | House | Record vote RV#1023 |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed |
2023-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#981 |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
FOOD
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
FOOD
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs