TX HB457 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-11)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-11)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidentiality of certain home address information in ad valorem tax appraisal records.
Title
Relating to the confidentiality of certain home address information in ad valorem tax appraisal records.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Holland [R] | Rep. John Wray [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] |
Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R] | Rep. Dewayne Burns [R] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] | Rep. Charlie Geren [R] |
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Cole Hefner [R] | Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D] | Rep. Eric Johnson [D] |
Rep. Mark Keough [R] | Rep. Stan Lambert [R] | Rep. Mike Lang [R] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] |
Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Dade Phelan [R] |
Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Rep. Hugh Shine [R] | Rep. Ron Simmons [R] |
Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] | Rep. Shawn Thierry [D] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] |
Rep. Tomas Uresti [D] | Rep. Jason Villalba [R] | Sen. Craig Estes [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1896 (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#243 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#243 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-26 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-13 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed |
2017-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-03-22 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-03-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-29 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PEACE OFFICERS
Protection of Personal Information
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Protection of Personal Information
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts