TX HB4565 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of the criminal offense of sexual assault.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of the criminal offense of sexual assault.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Law Enforcement
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Law Enforcement
SEXUAL ASSAULT