TX HB4548 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 20 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1053 (Y: 142 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenatePassed
2019-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-05-08SenateRead first time
2019-05-07SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1053
2019-05-07HousePassed
2019-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-06HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-06HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-06HouseAmended 1-Frank
2019-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-26HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-03-26HouseRead first time
2019-03-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2423 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback