TX HB4545 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the assessment of public school students, the establishment of a strong foundations grant program, and providing accelerated instruction for students who fail to achieve satisfactory performance on certain assessment instruments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the assessment of public school students, the establishment of a strong foundations grant program, and providing accelerated instruction for students who fail to achieve satisfactory performance on certain assessment instruments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1689 (Y: 104 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Amended RV#1014 (Y: 82 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Failed to pass RV#978 (Y: 62 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective immediately
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1689
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenatePassed
2021-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-27SenateAmended
2021-05-27SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Lucio
2021-05-27SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-26SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-24SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-22SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-22SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-21SenateNo action taken in committee
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-17SenateReferred to Education
2021-05-17SenateRead first time
2021-05-14SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13HouseRecord vote RV#1014
2021-05-13HousePassed as amended
2021-05-13HouseAmended 2-K. King
2021-05-13HouseVote reconsidered
2021-05-12House1 legislative day notice-to call from Journal
2021-05-11HouseMotion to reconsider spread on the Journal
2021-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#978
2021-05-11HouseFailed to pass
2021-05-11HouseAmended 1-K. King
2021-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-10HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-10HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-10HouseAmended 2-Krause and K. King
2021-05-10HouseAmended 1-K. King and Krause
2021-05-10HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2094 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar
SB2094 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4545
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04545I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04545H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04545E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04545S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB04545F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB04545H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB04545H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB04545H31.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB04545H32.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB04545S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04545I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04545H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB04545H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB04545E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04545E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB04545F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4545&RcdVtNo=978&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4545&RcdVtNo=1014&Ch=H&Dt=05/13/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB4545&RcdVtNo=1689&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=129
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=130

Bill Comments 750

feedback