TX HB4533 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Referred to State Affairs

Summary

Relating to the conduct of charitable poker runs by certain nonprofit organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the conduct of charitable poker runs by certain nonprofit organizations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-14 Referred to State Affairs
2009-05-14 Read first time
2009-05-13 Received from the House
2009-05-12 Reported engrossed
2009-05-12 Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2009-05-12 Record vote
2009-05-12 Passed
2009-05-12 Read 3rd time
2009-05-12 Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2009-05-12 Passed to engrossment
2009-05-12 Read 2nd time
2009-05-12 Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2009-05-08 Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
2009-04-22 Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2009-04-21 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-04-21 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2009-04-15 Reported favorably as substituted
2009-04-15 Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2009-04-15 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2009-04-15 Committee substitute considered in committee
2009-04-15 Considered in public hearing
2009-04-15 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-03-26 Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2009-03-26 Read first time
2009-03-13 Filed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback