TX HB4532 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the development and operation of a transportation project by a regional mobility authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the development and operation of a transportation project by a regional mobility authority.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-13HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2140 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Transportation
SB2140 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Transportation

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback