TX HB4532 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Summary
Relating to reports regarding the provision of emergency ground ambulance services in counties.
Title
Relating to reports regarding the provision of emergency ground ambulance services in counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-07 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-07 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-09 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-03-26 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2081 (Same As) 2009-04-21 - Committee report printed and distributed