TX HB4525 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the approval of career and technology courses by the State Board of Education.
Title
Relating to the approval of career and technology courses by the State Board of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1161 (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1161 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-13 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-13 | House | Postponed 5/13/21 11:00 PM |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Science & Technology
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Science & Technology