TX HB4519 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the sale of fireworks on and before the Juneteenth holiday and on and before the Labor Day holiday.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the sale of fireworks on and before the Juneteenth holiday and on and before the Labor Day holiday.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to County Affairs
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2003 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Local Government
SB2003 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Local Government

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback