TX HB4509 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to instruction on informed American patriotism in public schools.
Title
Relating to instruction on informed American patriotism in public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1708 (Y: 124 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1097 (Y: 104 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1097 (Y: 104 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1708 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-21 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1097 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-13 | House | Amended 2-Ramos |
2021-05-13 | House | Amended 1-Bonnen |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2026 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar
SB2026 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar
SB2026 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--School Districts
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--School Districts