TX HB449 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to restrictive covenants regulating drought-resistant landscaping or water-conserving natural turf.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to restrictive covenants regulating drought-resistant landscaping or water-conserving natural turf.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-29HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-03-26HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-03-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-03-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-03-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-11HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2013-02-11HouseRead first time
2013-01-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback