TX HB4486 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to procedures for identifying defendants suspected of having a mental illness or intellectual disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to procedures for identifying defendants suspected of having a mental illness or intellectual disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-05-17SenateRead first time
2021-05-17SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1090
2021-05-14HousePassed
2021-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-07HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-29HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback