TX HB4475 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to transportation projects of a regional mobility authority.
Title
Relating to transportation projects of a regional mobility authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Lina Ortega [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2248 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Subjects
BORDER
Political Subdivisions
Purchasing
Purchasing--General
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Political Subdivisions
Purchasing
Purchasing--General
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous