TX HB4414 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the application of the sunset review process to the office of vehicle fleet management.
Title
Relating to the application of the sunset review process to the office of vehicle fleet management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-29 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-27 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-25 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Subjects
OFFICE OF VEHICLE FLEET MANAGEMENT
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset Bills
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset Bills
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General