TX HB441 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requiring the Texas Workforce Commission to pay the cost of taking a high school equivalency examination for certain individuals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requiring the Texas Workforce Commission to pay the cost of taking a high school equivalency examination for certain individuals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#879 (Y: 100 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - Read 2nd time RV#853 (Y: 76 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-05-07SenateRead first time
2019-05-02SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#879
2019-05-02HousePassed
2019-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-01HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-01HouseRecord vote RV#853
2019-05-01HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-20HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2019-02-20HouseRead first time
2018-11-30HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback