TX HB4395 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to state agency and local government security incident procedures.
Title
Relating to state agency and local government security incident procedures.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Mike Schofield [R] |
Rep. Lacey Hull [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions