TX HB4388 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the management of the permanent school fund by the School Land Board and the State Board of Education and a study regarding distributions from the permanent school fund to the available school fund.
Title
Relating to the management of the permanent school fund by the School Land Board and the State Board of Education and a study regarding distributions from the permanent school fund to the available school fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1921 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1044 (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1044 (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1921 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Taylor |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Fallon |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1044 |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-06 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2019-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND
SCHOOL LAND BOARD
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND
SCHOOL LAND BOARD