TX HB4376 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to self-settled asset protection trusts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to self-settled asset protection trusts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1649 (Y: 122 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - Amended RV#1574 (Y: 126 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-15SenateReferred to State Affairs
2023-05-15SenateRead first time
2023-05-15SenateReceived from the House
2023-05-12HouseReported engrossed
2023-05-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-12HouseRecord vote RV#1649
2023-05-12HousePassed
2023-05-12HouseRead 3rd time
2023-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#1574
2023-05-11HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2023-05-11HouseAmended 1-VanDeaver
2023-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2023-05-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2023-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2023-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2023-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2023-04-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2023-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-04-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2023-04-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-04-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-04-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-21HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2023-03-21HouseRead first time
2023-03-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2317 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Referred to State Affairs
SB2317 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback