TX HB436 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority to issue bonds of the Rockett Special Utility District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority to issue bonds of the Rockett Special Utility District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-18 - House - HB 436Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-17HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-17HouseSenate passage reported
2013-05-17SenateRecord vote
2013-05-17SenatePassed
2013-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-17SenateRecord vote
2013-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-17SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-05-17SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2013-05-17SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-04-22SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2013-04-22SenateRead first time
2013-04-22SenateReceived from the House
2013-04-18HouseReported engrossed
2013-04-18HouseRecord vote
2013-04-18HousePassed
2013-04-18HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-18HousePassed to engrossment
2013-04-18HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-18HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2013-04-15HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2013-04-09HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2013-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-03HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-26HouseRecommendations filed with the Speaker
2013-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-11HouseReferred to Special Purpose Districts
2013-02-11HouseRead first time
2013-01-10HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2013-01-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback