TX HB4346 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Summary
Relating to "no regrets" greenhouse gas emissions reduction strategies.
Title
Relating to "no regrets" greenhouse gas emissions reduction strategies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | |
2009-03-25 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB184 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09