TX HB4334 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of information regarding certain public assistance programs by public schools.
Title
Relating to the provision of information regarding certain public assistance programs by public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2082 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Education
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--Food Programs
Human Services--General
Human Services--Medical Assistance
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Human Services--Food Programs
Human Services--General
Human Services--Medical Assistance