TX HB4326 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the insurance premium tax credit for the certified rehabilitation of certified historic structures.
Title
Relating to the insurance premium tax credit for the certified rehabilitation of certified historic structures.
Sponsors
Rep. Cole Hefner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-08 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-08 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 813 |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB813 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor
Subjects
Historic Preservation & Museums
HISTORICAL COMMISSION, TEXAS
Insurance
Insurance--General
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise
HISTORICAL COMMISSION, TEXAS
Insurance
Insurance--General
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise