TX HB4325 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment and maintenance of a glaucoma comanagement registry.
Title
Relating to the establishment and maintenance of a glaucoma comanagement registry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2019-04-02 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
EYECARE & VISION
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
THERAPEUTIC OPTOMETRISTS
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
THERAPEUTIC OPTOMETRISTS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4325 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04325I.htm |